U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00215-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SETZER-HAYES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 18, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 10, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 09, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 15, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 13, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.