U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ABRAMS-WARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 20, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 05, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • January 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • October 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • October 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Arrest]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.