U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PARKS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • February 14, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 07, 2022: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2014 Amendment]
  • February 04, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 20, 2021: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.