U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00221-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARLSTEIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • April 13, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2022: [SEALED USPO Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • March 04, 2022: [Joint Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 07, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • November 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Memorandum]
  • October 26, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • October 26, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 02, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.