U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00220-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 12, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2022: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • February 08, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • February 08, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • February 08, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • February 07, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 10, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 29, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 15, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.