U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JENNINGS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 12, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Opinion]
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Order]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [USCA Opinion]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Appeal Transcript]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • August 03, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Terminate Criminal Case]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • July 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
  • June 27, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • June 10, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 01, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 09, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • February 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 29, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • December 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.