U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00212-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ZABLOUDIL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 02, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • July 26, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 12, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Declaration]
  • June 16, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 18, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Supplement]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 20, 2021: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.