U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00219-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ZALMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Garnishment]
  • May 20, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • May 19, 2022: [Garnishment]
  • May 19, 2022: [Declaration of Proof of Service]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Declaration of Proof of Service]
  • April 15, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 08, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • March 24, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • March 23, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • March 23, 2022: [Application for Writ by USA]
  • March 22, 2022: [Application for Writ by USA]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • February 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 28, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • December 03, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 05, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Exam Report SEALED]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.