U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TRUJILLO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • June 08, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • June 08, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 13, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • February 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 04, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 17, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 17, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 17, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.