U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HARRISON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 15, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 01, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 25, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 31, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 31, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Add Counts]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • December 21, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • December 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.