U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. QUITERIO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 05, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 16, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 08, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 25, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.