U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00210-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCRAE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 21, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 27, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 25, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.