U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00209-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHAVIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 13, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 10, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 03, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 19, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • February 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 07, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 07, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2022: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.