U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00204-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RIVERS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • May 11, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 05, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 14, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 14, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • December 17, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 17, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.