U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00203-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COOPER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [SEALED Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [SEALED Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Status Report ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Exam Report SEALED]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [SEALED Motion for Exam Report and Treatment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 12, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • March 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 21, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 23, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.