U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ANDREWS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 28, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • November 16, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 08, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 24, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 17, 2021: [Transcript]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 03, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • August 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 02, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 28, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.