U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00275-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aragon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.