U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00230-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCQUEEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 09, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • June 15, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • June 03, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • February 17, 2022: [Transmission of Update Item to USCA]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 14, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 05, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • June 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.