U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CRUMP
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 28, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 22, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • November 18, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 10, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • November 05, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 03, 2021: [Telephonic Notice]
  • November 01, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 22, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 21, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 13, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 06, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.