U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00231-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GARLAND
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • December 03, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 01, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 16, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 09, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 09, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.