U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00232-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HILLIE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • May 12, 2022: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • May 10, 2022: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 26, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 07, 2021: [Status Report ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • August 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 14, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 09, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.