U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00218-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Appeal Transcript]
  • January 09, 2023: [Appeal Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • November 16, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • November 02, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [SEALED USPO Memorandum]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 01, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 31, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 25, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 25, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 25, 2022: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.