U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CRAIG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 22, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • February 24, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • January 04, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 20, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 18, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 05, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.