U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00217-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NAVARRO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Declaration]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 20, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 17, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 02, 2021: [Status Report ]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • October 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 23, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.