U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00238-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santillan-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Release Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Release Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Release Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Release Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Reconsideration ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 03, 2021: [Transcript]
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • July 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.