U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Augustin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 24, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • May 24, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 24, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • May 19, 2022: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 04, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Release Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • June 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.