U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cardenas-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • October 20, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 16, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.