U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00276-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meier, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 08, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • August 26, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • July 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • July 01, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.