U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Camara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Seal ]
  • January 04, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Bond Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 05, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 12, 2022: [Release Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Release Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Release Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 27, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Release Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.