U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00317-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STRICKLAND
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 24, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 20, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 20, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 05, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • July 02, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 02, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 02, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.