U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • July 12, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Bench Trial]
  • November 29, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 23, 2021: [Witness List]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notification of Bond Violation - No Action Requested]
  • November 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 08, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 05, 2021: [Motions Referred]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 27, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 23, 2021: [Suppress]
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 21, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2021: [Bond]
  • July 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.