U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goodman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 03, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • December 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 29, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Document]
  • July 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 07, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.