U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00278-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cannady
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Protective Order ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 28, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • July 21, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.