U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 30, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 26, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 28, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.