U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00277-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dokes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.