U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 27, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • July 08, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 08, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Document]
  • May 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 19, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 19, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • April 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 25, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Arrest ]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.