U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bautista
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Seal ]
  • September 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • August 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.