U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00283-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McElrath
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 15, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.