U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00281-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neri-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 13, 2022: [Expedite ]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 20, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.