U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00280-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leach
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Seal ]
  • January 24, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 12, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Release Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Release Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Release Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 26, 2021: [Text Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.