U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00279-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Means
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 11, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 27, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 20, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.