U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00284-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Darling
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Surrender]
  • January 24, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Sentencing ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 09, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 09, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 29, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 29, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • February 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Release Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 04, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • July 09, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.