U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • October 04, 2022: [Mandate - USCA]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment - Reason for Amendment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Judgment - Reason for Amendment]
  • May 19, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • April 08, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • April 07, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 02, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • December 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 06, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • September 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 21, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • July 12, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 09, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 09, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.