U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 17, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arrest ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.