U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:06-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Proposed Order]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Certificate of Service ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • July 15, 2021: [1Fox Case Reassigned]
  • July 14, 2021: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 13, 2021: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.