U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Page
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • April 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 03, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 03, 2023: [Information - Felony]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Seal ]
  • August 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 22, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 16, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 14, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.