U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00287-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ward
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sentencing ]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Remark]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • February 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.