U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Espinoza-Cardona
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 22, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 15, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 14, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 14, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.