U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Godinez-Bautista
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 02, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 23, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • July 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.