U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gales et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 25, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 19, 2023: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 16, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 16, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • January 13, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • December 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • November 17, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 16, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 10, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 08, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Text Order]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 19, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.